Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/22/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/27/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/18/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/09/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/09/2004