Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/21/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/21/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 07/21/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/21/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/21/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/24/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/24/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/24/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/24/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/24/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/24/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/24/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/24/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/24/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/24/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/24/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/24/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/24/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/24/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/24/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/24/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/24/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/24/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/24/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/25/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/25/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/04/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/04/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/04/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/04/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/04/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/04/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/04/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/15/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/15/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/15/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/15/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/23/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 10/02/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/02/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/15/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/19/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/19/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 11/19/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/19/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/19/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/19/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/19/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/19/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/19/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/19/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/10/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/25/2004