Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 07/22/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 07/22/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/22/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 07/22/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 07/22/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/24/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/25/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/21/2003