Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/22/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/05/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/16/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/16/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/30/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/30/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/30/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/30/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/30/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/08/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 10/08/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/16/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/16/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/21/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/21/2003
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/21/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/21/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/29/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/29/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 10/29/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/06/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/06/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 01/27/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/27/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/27/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/04/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/10/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/03/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/03/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/30/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/30/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/30/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/11/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/15/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/15/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 07/08/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/08/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/14/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/14/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/17/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/17/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/17/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew