Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/05/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/05/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/05/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/05/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/09/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/30/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/01/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/04/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/04/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/04/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 11/05/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/06/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/06/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/06/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/06/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 11/06/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/06/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/06/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/06/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/07/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/07/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/12/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/14/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/14/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/19/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/21/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/21/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/20/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/20/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 01/23/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 01/27/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/03/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/06/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/25/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/25/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/03/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/03/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 03/16/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/01/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/21/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/02/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/09/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/08/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/09/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/09/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/22/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/07/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/07/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/07/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/07/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/08/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/08/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/16/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/16/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/16/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/16/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/16/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/16/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/16/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/16/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/17/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/18/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/18/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/07/2004