Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/05/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/10/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/24/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/25/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/25/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/25/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/25/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/26/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/03/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/04/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/10/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/10/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/10/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/23/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/28/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/18/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/18/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/09/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/18/2004