There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1000 Avenida Sanchez Osorio in Carolina, Puerto Rico, as the "Roberto Clemente Walker Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/10/2003Became Public Law No: 108-97. (TXT | PDF)
10/10/2003Signed by President.
10/03/2003Presented to President.
10/01/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/01/2003Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12303)
09/23/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8460)
07/23/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
10/10/2003Became Public Law No: 108-97. (TXT | PDF)
10/10/2003Signed by President.
10/03/2003HousePresented to President.
10/02/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/01/2003SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/01/2003SenateSenate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12303)
09/24/2003SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
09/23/2003-4:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/23/2003-4:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8460)
09/23/2003-3:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2826.
09/23/2003-3:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8460-8461)
09/23/2003-3:53pmHouseMr. Murphy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/12/2003HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
09/12/2003HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
07/23/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
07/23/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/23/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 07/23/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 07/23/2003

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform07/23/2003 Referred to
09/12/2003 Markup by
Senate Governmental Affairs09/24/2003 Referred to
10/01/2003 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.2826.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2826. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-97 (10/10/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the U.S. Postal Service facility located at 1000 Avenida Sanchez Osorio in Carolina, Puerto Rico, as the Roberto Clemente Walker Post Office Building.