Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/23/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 07/23/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/24/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/24/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/24/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/05/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/30/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/22/2004