Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/03/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/03/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/03/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/10/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/02/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/02/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/05/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/18/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/03/2004