Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/01/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/01/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/01/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/29/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/29/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/29/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/29/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/29/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/29/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/29/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/10/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/10/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/10/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/10/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/10/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/10/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/10/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/10/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 12/08/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/11/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/11/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/03/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/11/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/25/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/01/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/17/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/17/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/07/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/07/2004