Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/04/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/08/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/08/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/16/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/05/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/03/2004