Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/04/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/06/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/06/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/06/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/06/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/06/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/13/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/13/2004