Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/17/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/08/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 10/08/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/20/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/20/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/13/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 09/09/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/09/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/09/2004