Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 05/01/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/01/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/01/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/01/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/01/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/01/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/19/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/03/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/04/2003