Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/10/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/10/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/10/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/10/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/01/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/15/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/10/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/17/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/20/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/21/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/17/2004