Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/03/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/23/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/23/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/23/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/23/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/17/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2004