Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/24/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 07/24/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/03/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/04/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/05/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/09/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/17/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/17/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 09/25/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/05/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/05/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/10/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/02/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/02/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/02/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/14/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/08/2004