Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/15/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/05/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/09/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/18/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/24/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/30/2004
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/02/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/02/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/20/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/04/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/06/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/20/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/23/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/22/2004