Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/04/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/23/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 10/07/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 10/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/28/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/28/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/10/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/30/2004