Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/25/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/05/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/05/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/05/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/16/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/24/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/24/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/24/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/24/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/25/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/25/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/25/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/02/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/08/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/08/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/08/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/08/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/07/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 01/21/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/03/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 03/17/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/18/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/31/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/31/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/31/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/28/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/28/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/09/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/22/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/25/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 06/25/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/29/2004