Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/25/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/01/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/01/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/01/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/01/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/01/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/01/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/20/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/20/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/20/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/20/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/20/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/20/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/20/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/20/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/09/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/07/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/07/2004