Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/05/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/17/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/17/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/17/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/29/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/29/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/29/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/29/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/29/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/10/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/10/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/10/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/29/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/29/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/29/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 11/06/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/06/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/06/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/06/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/03/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/23/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/23/2004