Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/16/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/16/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/16/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/16/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/16/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/16/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/16/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/16/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 09/16/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/16/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 09/16/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/16/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/16/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/16/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/16/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/16/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/16/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/16/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/16/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/16/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/16/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/16/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/16/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/16/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/16/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/16/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 09/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/16/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/16/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/16/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/16/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/16/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/16/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/16/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/16/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/16/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/25/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/25/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/04/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 11/04/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/25/2004