Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/04/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/05/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/10/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/10/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/17/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/19/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/09/2003