Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/25/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/25/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/03/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/03/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/03/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/03/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/03/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/08/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/30/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/04/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/04/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/04/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/12/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/19/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/20/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/27/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/27/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/24/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/27/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/16/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/15/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/09/2004