Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/30/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/06/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/10/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/21/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/21/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/28/2004