Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/25/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/10/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/10/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/10/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/10/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/10/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/16/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/16/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/21/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/19/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/08/2004