Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/29/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/25/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/25/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/25/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/25/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/25/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/25/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/25/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/18/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/18/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/19/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/24/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/03/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/09/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/09/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/09/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/13/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/19/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/19/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/03/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/03/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/09/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/18/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/15/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/18/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/18/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/25/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/04/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/11/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/01/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/18/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/20/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/01/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/01/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/01/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/01/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/01/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/09/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/23/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/23/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/07/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/09/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/30/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/05/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/05/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 10/05/2004