Committees: H.R.2966 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources07/25/2003 Referred to
05/05/2004 Markup by
05/20/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-513
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands07/27/2003 Referred to
09/30/2003 Hearings by
04/22/2004 Markup by
04/22/2004 Reported by
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans07/27/2003 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health07/27/2003 Referred to
House Agriculture07/25/2003 Referred to
06/30/2004 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition, and Forestry07/31/2003 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/22/2004 Referred to