Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/29/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/12/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/12/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 02/04/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/11/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/24/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/24/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/24/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/03/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/11/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/01/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/01/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/21/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/07/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/07/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/23/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/04/2004