There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that Executive Order 13166 shall have no force or effect, and to prohibit the use of funds for certain purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/08/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/28/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Criminal Justice, Drug Policy and Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
01/08/2003Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/27/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/27/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/27/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/27/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/27/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/27/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/05/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/05/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/12/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/12/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/26/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 03/05/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/11/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/07/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/09/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/09/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/17/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/23/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/23/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/12/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/22/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/04/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Government Reform01/08/2003 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Criminal Justice, Drug Policy and Human Resources02/28/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.300.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.300. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2003)

Declares Executive Order 13166, "Improving Access to Services for Persons with Limited English Proficiency," to be null and void.

Prohibits the use of funds for the promulgation or enforcement of an executive order that creates an entitlement to services provided in a language other than English.