Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/07/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/08/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/17/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/05/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/19/2003