Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/04/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 09/04/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/16/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/16/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/30/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/02/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/08/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/09/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/22/2004