Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/04/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/01/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/01/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/01/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/18/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 11/18/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/24/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/24/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/30/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/30/2004