Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/09/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/09/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/09/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/09/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/09/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/09/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/09/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/10/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/10/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/10/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/10/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/10/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/10/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/15/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/15/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/15/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/15/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/15/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/16/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/16/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/16/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/16/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/16/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/16/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/16/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/17/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/17/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/17/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/17/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/17/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/17/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/17/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/17/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/17/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/17/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/17/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/17/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/17/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/17/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/17/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 09/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/17/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/17/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/17/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/17/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/17/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/18/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/18/2003
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22] 09/18/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/23/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/23/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/23/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/23/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/23/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/23/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/23/2003