Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/04/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/09/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/09/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/09/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/09/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/09/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/17/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/17/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/17/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/17/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/17/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/17/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/25/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/25/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/01/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/17/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/17/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/07/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/20/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/11/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/25/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/26/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/02/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/25/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/01/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/01/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/02/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/27/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/27/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/06/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/18/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/17/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/15/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/15/2004