Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/09/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/09/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/16/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/16/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/16/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/16/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/16/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/23/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/08/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/08/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/08/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/20/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/20/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/28/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/08/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/10/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/03/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/03/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/23/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/23/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/31/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/13/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/19/2004