Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/09/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/09/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/09/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 09/09/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/09/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/24/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/25/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/30/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/02/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/17/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/28/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/16/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/07/2004