Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-133 (11/22/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on October 8, 2003. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

District of Columbia Military Retirement Equity Act of 2003 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Policemen and Firemen's Retirement and Disability Act to permit a member or former member of the District of Columbia Metropolitan Police force, the DC Fire Department, the U.S. Park Police force, and the U.S. Secret Service to count previously performed military service as creditable service for purposes of calculating the retirement annuity payable to such member. Requires the member or former member, in order to qualify for such creditable service, to pay the member's employment office (or former member's appropriate benefits administration) an amount equal to seven percent of the amount of the military basic pay paid to the member for each period of military service after December 1956. Requires payments to be based on evidence of such basic pay or estimates of it, as the Mayor determines. Provides that payment of such amount by an active member must be completed before the member's date of retirement or October 1, 2006, whichever is later, for the member to retain credit for the service.

Declares that in any case where military service interrupts such creditable service and reemployment pursuant to Federal employment and reemployment rights of members of the uniformed services occurs on or after August 1, 1990, the deposit may not exceed the amount that would have been deducted and withheld under this Act from basic pay during the period of creditable service if the member had not performed the period of military service.

Provides that any such deposit made more than two years after the later of October 1, 2004 or the date on which the member first becomes a member following the period of military service concerned shall include interest computed and compounded annually, beginning on the expiration of the two-year period.

Limits the percentage of military basic pay for any period of military service after November 10, 1996, to the same percentage applicable for similarly interrupted creditable service under current law.

(Sec. 3) Amends the National Capital Revitalization and Self-Government Improvement Act of 1997 to provide that, in determining the amount of a Federal benefit payment made to an officer or member of the DC Police force or the DC Fire Department, the benefit payment to which the officer or member is entitled under the District Retirement Program shall include any amounts which would have been included under such Program (military service adjustment) if this Act's amendments had taken effect before June 30, 1997 (the freeze date).