Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/16/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/16/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/16/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/16/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/16/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/24/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/24/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/24/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/24/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/24/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/24/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/24/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/24/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 09/24/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/24/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/30/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/30/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/30/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/07/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/07/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/07/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/07/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 10/21/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/29/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 11/05/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/18/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/21/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/18/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/08/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/17/2004