There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Clarifications to the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act to make certain technical corrections, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/10/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/03/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/10/2003Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/10/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/23/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/23/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/23/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/23/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 10/16/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/16/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/16/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/17/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/17/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 11/21/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/30/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/30/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/30/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 01/30/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/30/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/30/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/30/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/30/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/30/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/26/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/24/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/24/2004
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/04/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/19/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/13/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services09/10/2003 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit10/03/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3066.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3066. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/10/2003)

Clarifications to the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act - Amends the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act to state that formal pleadings in a civil action shall not be considered the kind of communication (initial or otherwise) required for a validation of debt notice.

Prescribes an alternative version of the initial communication debt collectors are required to give consumers, incorporating the three statements currently specified.

States that collection activities and communications may continue during the 30 days following a debt collector's initial notice to the debtor.

States that, if the consumer's attorney at law fails to respond to a communication from a debt collector within 30 days (currently, a reasonable period of time) after receiving a communication from the collector, such collector may communicate directly with the consumer.

Limits to one the number of additional communications a debt collector may make to a consumer after the consumer has notified the collector in writing that the consumer refuses to pay the debt or wishes the collector to cease further communication. Limits the content of any such additional communication to one of the three purposes already specified by the Act.

Revises notice of debt guidelines to require one of the debt collector's mandatory statements to specify that a consumer's dispute of the validity of a debt be submitted in writing in order to preclude an assumption by the collector that the debt is valid.