Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/10/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 09/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/23/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/23/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/23/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/23/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 10/16/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/16/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/16/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/17/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/17/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 11/21/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/30/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/30/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/30/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 01/30/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/30/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/30/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/30/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/30/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/30/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/26/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/24/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/24/2004
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/04/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/19/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/13/2004