Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/01/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/01/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/21/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/21/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/21/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/21/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/21/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/21/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/21/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/30/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/18/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/17/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/17/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/17/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/17/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/02/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/28/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/28/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/17/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/02/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/02/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/02/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/16/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/16/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/16/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/17/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/23/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/09/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/13/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/21/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/21/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/21/2004