There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

TEA-21 bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Surface Transportation Extension Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide an extension of highway, highway safety, motor carrier safety, transit, and other programs funded out of the Highway Trust Fund pending enactment of a law reauthorizing the Transportation Equity Act for the 21st Century.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/16/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
09/23/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Resources
09/17/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways, Transit and Pipelines.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/16/2003Referred to House Science
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2003Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2003Referred to House Budget
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2003Referred to House Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2003Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2003Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Resources, the Budget, Ways and Means, and Science, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/16/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/16/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 09/16/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/16/2003

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/16/2003 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways, Transit and Pipelines09/17/2003 Referred to
House Resources09/16/2003 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans09/23/2003 Referred to
House Budget09/16/2003 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/16/2003 Referred to
House Science09/16/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3088. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/16/2003)

Surface Transportation Extension Act of 2003 - Extends Federal highway, highway safety, motor carrier safety, and transit programs for six months, and authorizes appropriations, through March 31, 2004.

Directs the Secretary of Transportation to: (1) apportion funds made available for Federal-aid highway programs under the Transportation Equity Act for the 21st Century (TEA-21) to each State according to the ratio of the State's FY 2003 obligation authority to the FY 2003 obligation authority for all States; and (2) ensure that each State is apportioned funds for the Interstate maintenance program, the National Highway System program, the bridge program, the surface transportation program, the congestion mitigation and air quality improvement program, the recreational trails program, the Appalachian development highway system program, and the minimum guarantee.

Sets forth provisions: (1) for reducing future apportionments, and for recovering funds not apportioned, under a law reauthorizing the Federal-aid highway program that is enacted after enactment of this Act; (2) prohibiting States from obligating any Federal-aid highway program funds after March 31, 2004, until the earlier of the date of enactment of a multi-year law reauthorizing such program or June 30 2004; and (3) directing the Secretary of Transportation, on the earlier of such enactment date or June 1, 2004, to distribute to each State any remaining amounts of obligation authority for Federal-aid highways and highway safety construction programs by allocation as provided in an Act making appropriations for the Department of Transportation for FY 2004

Amends the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 and TEA-21, respectively, to set related discretionary spending limits and obligation limitations for FY 2004.