Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/16/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/17/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/17/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/17/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/17/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/30/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/30/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/30/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/30/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/30/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/30/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/30/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/01/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/15/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/16/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/21/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/18/2004