Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 01/28/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 01/28/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/28/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/28/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/28/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 01/28/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/28/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/28/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/28/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/28/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/28/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 04/10/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/05/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/09/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 09/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/10/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/11/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/15/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/15/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/17/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/17/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/25/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/30/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/08/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/21/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/19/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/31/2004