There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To provide for the establishment of separate campaign medals to be awarded to members of the uniformed services who participate in Operation Enduring Freedom and to members of the uniformed services who participate in Operation Iraqi Freedom.

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the establishment of campaign medals to be awarded to members of the Armed Forces who participate in Operation Enduring Freedom or Operation Iraqi Freedom.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
05/28/2004Became Public Law No: 108-234. (TXT | PDF)
05/28/2004Signed by President.
05/20/2004Presented to President.
05/18/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 0. Record Vote Number: 96.
05/11/2004Committee on Armed Services. Reported by Senator Warner without amendment. Without written report.
03/30/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 102).(text: CR H1690)
09/16/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
05/28/2004Became Public Law No: 108-234. (TXT | PDF)
05/28/2004Signed by President.
05/20/2004HousePresented to President.
05/19/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/18/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 0. Record Vote Number: 96.
05/18/2004SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5566-5569)
05/11/2004SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 507.
05/11/2004SenateCommittee on Armed Services. Reported by Senator Warner without amendment. Without written report.
05/06/2004SenateCommittee on Armed Services. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/31/2004SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
03/30/2004-5:53pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
03/30/2004-5:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/30/2004-5:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 102). (text: CR H1690)
03/30/2004-5:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1712)
03/30/2004-2:36pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/30/2004-2:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3104.
03/30/2004-2:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1690-1693)
03/30/2004-2:19pmHouseMr. Simmons moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/17/2004HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/17/2004HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
10/03/2003HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOD.
09/16/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
09/16/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (103)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/07/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/07/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/07/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/07/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/07/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/16/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/16/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/16/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/30/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/18/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/18/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/21/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/21/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/21/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/21/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/28/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/28/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/28/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/28/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/28/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/28/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/28/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/11/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/11/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/11/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/11/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/11/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/11/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/11/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/11/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/11/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/11/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/11/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/11/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/11/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/11/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/17/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/17/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/17/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/18/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/23/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/23/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/23/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/23/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/29/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services09/16/2003 Referred to
03/17/2004 Markup by
Senate Armed Services03/31/2004 Referred to
05/06/2004 Markup by
05/11/2004 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3104. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-234 (05/28/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on March 30, 2004. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directs the President to establish separate campaign medals to recognize service by members of the uniformed services in Operation Enduring Freedom or Operation Iraqi Freedom.