Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/16/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/16/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/07/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/07/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/07/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/07/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/07/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/16/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/16/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/16/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/30/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/18/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/18/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/21/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/21/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/21/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/21/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/28/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/28/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/28/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/28/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/28/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/28/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/28/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/11/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/11/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/11/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/11/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/11/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/11/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/11/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/11/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/11/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/11/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/11/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/11/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/11/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/11/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/17/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/17/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/17/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/18/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/23/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/23/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/23/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/23/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/29/2004