Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/02/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/02/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/02/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/02/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/15/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/15/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/15/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/17/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/20/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/20/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/05/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/05/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/05/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/05/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/05/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/07/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/07/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/07/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/07/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/07/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/07/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/07/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/07/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 11/07/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/07/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/07/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/07/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/07/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/07/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/07/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/07/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/07/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 11/07/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/07/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/07/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/07/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 11/07/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/07/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/07/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/07/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/07/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/07/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 11/07/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/07/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/07/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 11/07/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 11/07/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/07/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/07/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/07/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 11/07/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/07/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/07/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/07/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/07/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/07/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/07/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/07/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/17/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/17/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/17/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/17/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/17/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/17/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 11/17/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/17/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/17/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/19/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 11/19/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/19/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/19/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 11/19/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/19/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/19/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 11/19/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 11/19/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/19/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 11/19/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 11/19/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/19/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/19/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 11/19/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/20/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/20/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 11/20/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/20/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/20/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 11/20/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/20/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/20/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/20/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/20/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/20/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/20/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/20/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 11/20/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 11/20/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/20/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/20/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 11/20/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 11/20/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/20/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/20/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/20/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/20/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 11/20/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/20/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/28/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/28/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/18/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/18/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/18/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/18/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/18/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/31/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/31/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/04/2004