Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/17/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/01/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 10/16/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/06/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/18/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/08/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/20/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/20/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/20/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/20/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/20/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/20/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/24/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/24/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/24/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/24/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/24/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 02/24/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/24/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/24/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/24/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/24/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/24/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/24/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/09/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/09/2004
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/09/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/09/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/17/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/17/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/30/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/30/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 03/30/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/13/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/19/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/19/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/19/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/19/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/17/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/17/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/17/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/17/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/17/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/17/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/17/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/17/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/17/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/17/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/17/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/25/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/25/2004
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/25/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/25/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/25/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/25/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/25/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/25/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/09/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/09/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/09/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/09/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/09/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/08/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/08/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/08/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/08/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/08/2004
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/08/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/08/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/08/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 09/08/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/08/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/14/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/14/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/14/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/14/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/23/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/23/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/30/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/30/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/30/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/30/2004
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/06/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/06/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/06/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/06/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/08/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/08/2004